MN HF3446 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-13 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-13 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment insurance eligibility modified under conditions for applicants involved in a labor dispute.
Title
Unemployment insurance eligibility modified under conditions for applicants involved in a labor dispute.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | House | Author added Jordan |
2024-04-29 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2024-04-18 | House | Author added Smith |
2024-04-15 | House | Author added Pérez-Vega |
2024-04-11 | House | Author added Lee, K. |
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Hussein |
2024-03-20 | House | Authors added Hassan and Koegel |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-02-28 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3588 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Development