MN HF3444 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-24 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-24 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parent's Bill of Rights created.
Title
Parent's Bill of Rights created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-24 | House | Author added Munson |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Robbins |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3064 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy