MN HF3434 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ethnic studies requirement created, Ethnic Studies Task Force created, rulemaking authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Ethnic studies requirement created, Ethnic Studies Task Force created, rulemaking authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Vang |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Hornstein, Hollins, Pinto, Long, Fischer and Edelson |
2022-03-07 | House | Authors added Keeler, Davnie, and Youakim |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Wazlawik |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2022-02-24 | House | Authors added Jordan, Berg, Hassan and Feist |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Boldon and Lippert |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3557 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy