MN HF3433 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Subminimum wage eliminated, task force on subminimum wage elimination created, statutes and rules allowing payment to employees with disabilities repealed, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subminimum wage eliminated, task force on subminimum wage elimination created, statutes and rules allowing payment to employees with disabilities repealed, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseAuthor added Gomez
2020-02-27HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
2020-02-26HouseAuthor added Olson
2020-02-24HouseAuthor added Jordan
2020-02-18HouseAuthor added Richardson
2020-02-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Labor

Same As/Similar To

SF3561 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback