MN HF3429 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled veterans homestead exclusion spousal benefit modified.
Title
Disabled veterans homestead exclusion spousal benefit modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] |
Rep. Keith Franke [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Anna Wills [R] |
Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Regina Barr [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Sandstede. |
2018-03-19 | House | Authors added Murphy, M; Sundin; and Bahr, C. |
2018-03-15 | House | Authors added Petersburg; Franke; Franson; Bennett; Wills; Haley; Lien; Barr, R.; and Ecklund. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2018-03-12 | House | Authors added Pugh and Poston. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3261 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Authors added Bigham; Newton