MN HF342 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Authors added Hamilton and Noor
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota African American Family Preservation and Child Welfare Disproportionality Act established, African American and Disproportionality Child Welfare Oversight Council created, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota African American Family Preservation and Child Welfare Disproportionality Act established, African American and Disproportionality Child Welfare Oversight Council created, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthors added Hamilton and Noor
2019-03-28HouseAuthors added Cantrell and Halverson
2019-03-18HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Freiberg
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Fischer
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Lee
2019-01-28HouseAuthor added Dehn.
2019-01-24HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF730 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback