MN HF3403 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Preliminary application procedure established for individuals seeking professional licenses, licensing boards permitted to charge application fees, appeals authorized, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Preliminary application procedure established for individuals seeking professional licenses, licensing boards permitted to charge application fees, appeals authorized, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2022-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Rasmusson |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Long |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Huot |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF3036 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance