MN HF3396 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Mariani
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Mariani
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Student discipline and nonexclusionary disciplinary policies and practices modified.
Title
Student discipline and nonexclusionary disciplinary policies and practices modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Mariani |
2020-03-04 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Her as chief author |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3650 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy