MN HF3391 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Author added Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Author added Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Guardianship and conservatorship provisions modernized and modified.
Title
Guardianship and conservatorship provisions modernized and modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Author added Johnson |
2020-05-15 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-05-15 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3258 |
2020-05-14 | House | Author added Mariani as chief author |
2020-04-30 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3258 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed