MN HF3378 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's school-linked mental health gran funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Children's school-linked mental health gran funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] |
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein. |
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Bly. |
2018-03-08 | House | Authors added Lee and Loeffler. |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2815 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Author added Wiklund