MN HF3372 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Boldon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Boldon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
African American-specialized mental health center and clinic funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
African American-specialized mental health center and clinic funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] |
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. John Thompson [D] |
Sen. Liz Boldon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Boldon |
2022-02-23 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Behavioral Health Policy Division |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3276 (Similar To) 2022-02-21 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy