MN HF3369 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dog and cat sale by retail pet shops prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dog and cat sale by retail pet shops prohibited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2020-03-09HouseAuthor added Hausman
2020-03-05HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2020-03-04HouseAuthors added Vang, Pinto, and Davnie
2020-03-02HouseAuthors added Hornstein and Bahner
2020-02-24HouseAuthors added Freiberg, Wolgamott, Stephenson, and Elkins
2020-02-18HouseAuthors added Gunther, Halverson, and Becker-Finn
2020-02-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF3307 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback