MN HF3360 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driver education program access expanded for low-income students, driver education work group established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Driver education program access expanded for low-income students, driver education work group established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Clardy [D] | Rep. Matt Norris [D] | Rep. Elliott Engen [R] | Rep. Andrew Smith [D] |
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Author added Edelson |
2024-02-22 | House | Author added Smith |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Engen |
2024-02-14 | House | Author added Norris |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |