MN HF3360 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of health required to study issues of statewide register development for provider orders for life-sustaining treatment, and report required.
Title
Commissioner of health required to study issues of statewide register development for provider orders for life-sustaining treatment, and report required.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Bierman |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Huot, Freiberg, Bahner and Boldon |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Edelson |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Pryor |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3339 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Author added Nelson