MN HF3358 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Authors added Lee and Davnie.
Pending: House Transportation and Regional Governance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Authors added Lee and Davnie.
Pending: House Transportation and Regional Governance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety commissioner required to report on driver's license suspensions and revocations.
Title
Public safety commissioner required to report on driver's license suspensions and revocations.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] |
Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Authors added Lee and Davnie. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Clark. |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3390 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy