MN HF3347 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth intervention program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Youth intervention program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Long |
2020-02-18 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3277 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy