MN HF334 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training membership expanded.
Title
Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training membership expanded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-30 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF171 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy