MN HF331 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Tobacco; charter schools added to prohibition of tobacco in schools, tobacco sale age increased, administrative penalties increased, municipal license of tobacco provision added, and alternative penalties allowed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco; charter schools added to prohibition of tobacco in schools, tobacco sale age increased, administrative penalties increased, municipal license of tobacco provision added, and alternative penalties allowed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2019-03-13HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseAuthors added Her, Elkins, and Noor
2019-02-28HouseAuthors added Nornes, Long, and Hansen
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Kotyza-Witthuhn
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Olson, Mann, and Brand
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce
2019-02-07HouseAuthor added Acomb
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Wagenius.
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Christensen
2019-01-28HouseAuthors added Loeffler and Freiberg.
2019-01-24HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF463 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback