MN HF3302 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Soil health funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Soil health funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Huot |
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Berg |
2022-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |