MN HF3275 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution memorializing Congress that the Legislature of the State of Minnesota reaffirms its ratification of the Child Labor Amendment to the United States Constitution.
Title
A resolution memorializing Congress that the Legislature of the State of Minnesota reaffirms its ratification of the Child Labor Amendment to the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Hussein |
2024-03-21 | House | Author added Hill |
2024-03-13 | House | Authors added Virnig, Huot, Newton and Freiberg |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3300 (Similar To) 2023-04-25 - Referred to Rules and Administration