MN HF3271 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Authors added Poston and Elkins
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Authors added Poston and Elkins
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Explore Minnesota Tourism funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Explore Minnesota Tourism funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Authors added Poston and Elkins |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Huot |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Baker |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3111 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance