MN HF3270 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Author added Youakim
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Author added Youakim
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human Rights Act sections removed that allow sexual orientation discrimination.
Title
Human Rights Act sections removed that allow sexual orientation discrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Author added Youakim |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Fischer |
2022-03-07 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF3088 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy