MN HF3260 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education; malicious and sadistic conduct involving race, gender, religion, sexual harassment, sexual orientation, and sexual exploitation prohibited.
Title
Education; malicious and sadistic conduct involving race, gender, religion, sexual harassment, sexual orientation, and sexual exploitation prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2022-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Pryor |
2022-03-07 | House | Authors added Carlson, Moller, Jordan, and Feist |
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Howard; Fischer; Gomez; Hornstein; Xiong, J.; Edelson; Moran; Lippert; Stephenson; and Mariani |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Boldon |
2022-02-17 | House | Authors added Thompson and Hassan |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3094 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy