MN HF325 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Schultz
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Author added Schultz
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reimbursement grants to local units of governments for public safety personnel on authorized leave provided.
Title
Reimbursement grants to local units of governments for public safety personnel on authorized leave provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Schultz |
2020-02-20 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn and Mann |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF305 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Chief author added Housley