MN HF3249 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child support; arrears reporting requirement modified.
Title
Child support; arrears reporting requirement modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3920 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy