MN HF3246 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author added Lippert
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author added Lippert
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Microdistillery license requirements changed.
Title
Microdistillery license requirements changed.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Author added Lippert |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Olson |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF3870 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Author added Jensen