MN HF3240 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Boldon
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Boldon
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Physical therapy practice provisions modified.
Title
Physical therapy practice provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Boldon |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Baker |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added West |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Long |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Howard |
2022-02-17 | House | Authors added Stephenson, Elkins, Masin, Schomacker, Garofalo, Moller, Feist, Hassan, Freiberg, Gruenhagen, and Moran |
2022-02-15 | House | Authors added Acomb and Lippert |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Rasmusson |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3083 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Authors added Newton; Duckworth; Fateh