MN HF3233 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Authors added Boe and Bliss
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Authors added Boe and Bliss
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ballots required to be printed on unique watermarked paper, and exception for ballots distributed for military and overseas absentee voters.
Title
Ballots required to be printed on unique watermarked paper, and exception for ballots distributed for military and overseas absentee voters.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Susan Akland [R] | Rep. John Burkel [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] |
Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Authors added Boe and Bliss |
2022-02-15 | House | Author added McDonald |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Burkel |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF2956 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections