MN HF3228 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription Drug Affordability Act established, prescription drug affordability commission and prescription drug affordability requirements created, and report required.
Title
Prescription Drug Affordability Act established, prescription drug affordability commission and prescription drug affordability requirements created, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-03-11 | House | Authors added Pinto and Mariani |
2020-03-09 | House | Authors added Lien and Lippert |
2020-03-05 | House | Authors added Hansen, Freiberg, and Wazlawik |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Schultz |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Lillie |
2020-02-26 | House | Authors added Hamilton and Becker-Finn |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Bierman |
2020-02-20 | House | Authors added Hassan and Stephenson |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2020-02-19 | House | Authors added Lesch and Gomez |
2020-02-18 | House | Authors added Cantrell, Moran, and Pryor |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF3120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy