MN HF3224 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 110 05/03/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 110 05/03/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Credit union membership, governance, and powers and duties regulated.
Title
Credit union membership, governance, and powers and duties regulated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Secretary of State Chapter 110 05/03/18 | |
2018-05-03 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-03 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-03 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-01 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-01 | House | Returned from Senate |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2843 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2843, now on General Orders |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-04-12 | House | Bill was passed vote: 127-0 |
2018-04-12 | House | Third reading |
2018-04-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 12, 2018. |
2018-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2843 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3224