MN HF3220 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electric vehicle charging station installation and fee collection allowed at interstate rest areas.
Title
Electric vehicle charging station installation and fee collection allowed at interstate rest areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Author added Vang |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Pryor |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3137 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Author added Murphy