MN HF3217 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pari-mutuel horse racing provisions relating to licensing and regulation modified.
Title
Pari-mutuel horse racing provisions relating to licensing and regulation modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3702 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Second reading