MN HF3211 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Author added Dean, M.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Author added Dean, M.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Louis Park; Perspectives Family Center expansion and renovation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Louis Park; Perspectives Family Center expansion and renovation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Dean, M. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2018-03-05 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3597 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Referred to Capital Investment