MN HF3204 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Pugh.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Pugh.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Breast cancer screening procedure coverage required.
Title
Breast cancer screening procedure coverage required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Albright. |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Reform |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Barr, R. |
2018-03-08 | House | Authors added Youakim and Slocum. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2973 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Second reading