MN HF3203 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Author added Gruenhagen.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Author added Gruenhagen.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Penalties for school employees and independent contractors who have sexual relationships with students established.
Title
Penalties for school employees and independent contractors who have sexual relationships with students established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Gruenhagen. |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3718 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy