MN HF320 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm safety, archery, hunting, and angling inclusion in school physical education course grant program established; report required; and money appropriated.
Title
Firearm safety, archery, hunting, and angling inclusion in school physical education course grant program established; report required; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Igo |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Poston and Albright |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Lucero, Franson, Raleigh, Daniels, and Nash |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF412 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy