MN HF319 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chiropractic practice clarified to include telemedicine services, Board of Chiropractic Examiners authority to discipline a chiropractor not following an executive order clarified, and animal chiropractic sections reorganized.
Title
Chiropractic practice clarified to include telemedicine services, Board of Chiropractic Examiners authority to discipline a chiropractor not following an executive order clarified, and animal chiropractic sections reorganized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Reyer |
2021-01-28 | House | Authors added Koegel and Pryor |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF266 (Similar To) 2021-02-15 - Author added Abeler