MN HF3187 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Author added Anselmo.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Author added Anselmo.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Council funding provided for regional park and open-space land acquisition and improvements, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Metropolitan Council funding provided for regional park and open-space land acquisition and improvements, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Author added Anselmo. |
2018-04-19 | House | Author added Runbeck. |
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added Fischer, Loeffler, Christensen, Mariani, and Masin. |
2018-04-09 | House | Authors added Ward, Franke, Youakim, Nelson, and Mahoney. |
2018-03-29 | House | Authors added Kunesh-Podein and Jurgens. |
2018-03-28 | House | Authors added Carlson, L.; Freiberg; and Hilstrom. |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2018-03-08 | House | Authors added Pinto, Dettmer, Wills, and Slocum. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3308 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Referred to Capital Investment