MN HF3182 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Authors added Urdahl and Davids
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public employees insurance program modifications made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees insurance program modifications made.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30HouseAuthors added Urdahl and Davids
2024-04-29HouseAuthors stricken Davids and Urdahl
2024-04-24HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2024-04-24HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2024-04-18HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3204
2024-03-25HouseAuthor added Huot
2024-03-25HouseSecond reading
2024-03-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2024-03-14HouseAuthor added Virnig
2024-03-07HouseAuthor added Olson, L. added as chief author
2023-03-30HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF3204 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Secretary of State, Filed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback