MN HF3180 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-07 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-07 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Food packaging chemical use regulated.
Title
Food packaging chemical use regulated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2020-03-26 | House | Authors added Masin, Edelson |
2020-03-12 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF3225 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy