MN HF3174 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human services background studies disqualification of individuals with expunged criminal records prohibited.
Title
Human services background studies disqualification of individuals with expunged criminal records prohibited.
Sponsors
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Pierson |
2020-02-17 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-02-13 | House | Author added Hamilton |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF2956 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy