MN HF3171 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Western Lake Superior Sanitary District secondary clarifier improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Western Lake Superior Sanitary District secondary clarifier improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Sundin |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF3197 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Author added Bakk