MN HF3166 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extended time revenue for summer programs for students placed at corrections facilities authorized.
Title
Extended time revenue for summer programs for students placed at corrections facilities authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein. |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Bly. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3104 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Referred to E-12 Policy