MN HF3159 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permanency disposition law purpose modified when child cannot be placed with parents, and permanency dispositions modified when child cannot return home.
Title
Permanency disposition law purpose modified when child cannot be placed with parents, and permanency dispositions modified when child cannot return home.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3984 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy