MN HF3158 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; vaccine requirement prohibited, and exceptions provided.
Title
COVID-19; vaccine requirement prohibited, and exceptions provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Author added Backer |
2022-04-19 | House | Author added Kiel |
2022-04-08 | House | Author added Bliss |
2022-04-07 | House | Authors added Davids and Akland |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Grossell |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Neu Brindley, Hertaus |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2022-02-28 | House | Authors added Boe, Bennett, Franson, Heintzeman and Burkel |
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Dettmer, Lueck and Poston |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Erickson |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4489 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Author added Benson