MN HF3151 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Knoblach.
Pending: House Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Knoblach.
Pending: House Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Citizens' right to be secure from unreasonable searches and seizures of electronic communications and data provided, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Citizens' right to be secure from unreasonable searches and seizures of electronic communications and data provided, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
Rep. Jim Knoblach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Knoblach. |
2018-03-05 | House | Authors added Lucero; Bahr, C.; and Lien. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2706 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy