MN HF3119 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State agency value initiative (SAVI) program established for state agencies to encourage innovation and cost saving.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agency value initiative (SAVI) program established for state agencies to encourage innovation and cost saving.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseCommittee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Ways and Means
2020-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance Division
2020-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF4279 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback