MN HF3114 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School-based health center activity grant established, and money appropriated.
Title
School-based health center activity grant established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Sandell [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy |
2022-02-07 | House | Authors added Bierman, Wazlawik |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3348 (Similar To) 2022-02-21 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy