MN HF3107 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Innovation research zone partner allowed to use a nationally recognized high school academic assessment.
Title
Innovation research zone partner allowed to use a nationally recognized high school academic assessment.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division |
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Elkins |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3699 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy