MN HF3106 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Standardized assessment task force created, and report required.
Title
Standardized assessment task force created, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2020-02-13 | House | Author added Youakim |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3689 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy